Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/12/2021 at 17:40:09 (UTC).

RAFFI EL CHEMALIAN VS GARNI DADAIAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 RAFFI EL CHEMALIAN filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GARNI DADAIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6410

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EL CHEMALIAN RAFFI

Defendants

DADAIAN GARNI

DADAIAN SHAGHIG J.

DADAIAN STEVEN J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KING DANIEL J

Defendant Attorney

VELASTEGUI MARVIN

 

Court Documents

Answer

7/30/2020: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

7/30/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/30/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

PI General Order

5/15/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/29/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/29/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2023
  • Hearing04/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • Hearing10/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • Hearing10/13/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Garni Dadaian (Defendant); Steven J. Dadaian (Defendant); Shaghig J. Dadaian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Garni Dadaian (Defendant); Steven J. Dadaian (Defendant); Shaghig J. Dadaian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Garni Dadaian (Defendant); Steven J. Dadaian (Defendant); Shaghig J. Dadaian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Raffi El Chemalian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Raffi El Chemalian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KING DANIEL J. ESQ.