This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/04/2020 at 11:36:20 (UTC).

RAFAELA LOPEZ VS BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY DIRECT CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/11/2020 RAFAELA LOPEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY DIRECT CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2021

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOPEZ RAFAELA

Defendants

BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY DIRECT CORPORATION

BURLINGTON STORES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MITCHELL TIMOTHY P MITCHELL

Defendant Attorney

GRAMLING KEVIN JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER (STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT)

9/30/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER (STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT)

Answer

7/2/2020: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/2/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

6/19/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/22/2020: PI General Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/11/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/11/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/11/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/12/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2023
  • Hearing06/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • Hearing12/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Hearing11/29/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order ((STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT)); Filed by Burlington Coat Factory of Texas, Inc. Erroneously Sued As Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Burlington Coat Factory of Texas, Inc. Erroneously Sued As Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Burlington Coat Factory of Texas, Inc. Erroneously Sued As Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Rafaela Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Rafaela Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rafaela Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rafaela Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rafaela Lopez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BURLINGTON STORES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY DIRECT CORPORATION is a litigant