This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/12/2021 at 01:53:51 (UTC).

RAFAEL VILLARRUEL, AN INDIVIDUAL VS LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/21/2019 RAFAEL VILLARRUEL, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMAS D. LONG, CHARLES C. LEE and AUDRA MORI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7594

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

THOMAS D. LONG

CHARLES C. LEE

AUDRA MORI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VILLARRUEL AN INDIVIDUAL RAFAEL

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT A PUBLIC ENTITY

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

CITY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AZIZI DANIEL

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

VAN DEERLIN ABAIGEAL L.

MORENO JEANNIE MARGARET

 

Court Documents

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

9/9/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Cross-Complaint

7/6/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

7/6/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/27/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/7/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/7/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

9/8/2020: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

9/8/2020: Cross-Complaint

Answer

9/8/2020: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/8/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

10/13/2020: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT AS TO DEFENDANT COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

10/29/2020: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

3/15/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/15/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

11/15/2019: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/21/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/21/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/21/2019: Complaint

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2022
  • Hearing10/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • Hearing07/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • Hearing06/24/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Audra Mori, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by RAFAEL VILLARRUEL, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by CITY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by RAFAEL VILLARRUEL, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by RAFAEL VILLARRUEL, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by RAFAEL VILLARRUEL, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by RAFAEL VILLARRUEL, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by RAFAEL VILLARRUEL, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by RAFAEL VILLARRUEL, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less