This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2019 at 21:49:36 (UTC).

RAFAEL MEDINA JR. VS. IVETTE RIVERA MEDINA

Case Summary

On 01/17/2017 RAFAEL MEDINA JR filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against IVETTE RIVERA MEDINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT and PUENTE-PORRAS, MARIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8170

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT

PUENTE-PORRAS, MARIA

 

Party Details

Petitioners

MEDINA RAFAEL

MEDINA RAFAEL JR

Respondent

MEDINA IVETTE RIVERA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

REBEIL CRISTINA

REBEIL CRISTINA M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2019
  • at 8:30 AM in Department S14, Puente-Porras, Maria, Presiding; FCCR Conference - Held - FCCR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Notice - FCCR Conference (Notice by LASC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Notice - Case Review Re: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Notice - Case Review Re: Default (Noticed by LASC )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • at 8:30 AM in Department 3101, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Case Review Conference - Off Calendar - No Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • Notice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Medina, Rafael - Filed and Entered on 2017-05-12 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • 1st Notice Sent (Entered Date: 05-18-17 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Declaration - UCCJEA (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Medina, Rafael - Filed and Entered on 2017-01-17 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Medina, Rafael - Filed and Entered on 2017-01-17 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 (In Whole - On Behalf of: Petitioner: Medina, Rafael - Granted on 2017-01-17 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Petition - Family Law Other (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Medina, Rafael - Filed and Entered on 2017-01-17 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Summons (- On Behalf of: Petitioner: Medina, Rafael - Issued on 2017-01-17 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer REBEIL CRISTINA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REBEIL CRISTINA M