This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2019 at 07:25:09 (UTC).

RAFAEL DAVID MIRANDA VS ANDRES CONTRERAS ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/09/2018 RAFAEL DAVID MIRANDA filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ANDRES CONTRERAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT and RUTH ANN KWAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7314

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

RUTH ANN KWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MIRANDA RAFAEL DAVID

Defendants and Respondents

LEON JOSE A.

CONTRERAS ANDRES

DOES 1 TO 20

LOPEZ RICHARD

LOPEZ IRMA

LMM REAL ESTATE INC.

QUEZADA MARIA I.

CHITJIAN MICHAEL

MEYERS STUART B.

RODRIGUEZ RUDY

INTEGRETY 1ST ESCROW COMPANY INC.

SOTO FRANK JR.

SOTO FRANK SR.

CENTURY 21 REAL ESTATE LLC

QUEZADA NICHOLAS A.

YALNEZIAN PAUL B.

SOTO GLORIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BICKENBACH PAUL H. ESQ.

YIM B. CASEY

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

KAUFMAN DOLOWICH & VOLUCK LLP

ROSS WERSCHING & WOLCOTT LLP

LEFF ANDREW LINCOLN

ROSS ALAN GEOFFREY

BRODSKY BARRY ZITRON ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/27/2018: NOTICE OF FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED QUIET TITLE COMPLAINT & JURY DEMAND, FOR: (1) WRONGFUL EVICTION; ETC

7/30/2018: PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED QUIET TITLE COMPLAINT & JURY DEMAND, FOR: (1) WRONGFUL EVICTION; ETC

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

9/20/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

(1) NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT RICHARD LOPEZ'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; (2) DEMURRER; (3) MEMORANDIJM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND (4) DECLARATION OF DANIEL J. LEE

9/25/2018: (1) NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT RICHARD LOPEZ'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; (2) DEMURRER; (3) MEMORANDIJM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND (4) DECLARATION OF DANIEL J. LEE

Notice of Continuance

10/26/2018: Notice of Continuance

Notice

12/4/2018: Notice

Notice

12/7/2018: Notice

Substitution of Attorney

2/6/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Case Management Statement

2/11/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order

2/14/2019: Minute Order

Request for Dismissal

2/26/2019: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for

3/19/2019: Certificate of Mailing for

Reply

3/25/2019: Reply

Proof of Service by Mail

5/3/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Dismissal

5/9/2019: Request for Dismissal

(1) NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT RICHARD LOPEZ'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; (2) DEMURRER; ETC.

5/11/2018: (1) NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT RICHARD LOPEZ'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; (2) DEMURRER; ETC.

REQUEST FOR D1SMS5AL

4/12/2018: REQUEST FOR D1SMS5AL

SUMMONS

3/9/2018: SUMMONS

109 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 74; Order to Show Cause Re: (re entry of default as to defendants Century 21 Real Estate, LLC, Rudy Rodriguez, Stuart B. Meyers, Integrity 1st Escrow Company, Inc., Paul B. Yalnezian, Michael Chitjian, Frank Soto, Jr., Gloria Soto, Nicholas A. Quezada, and Maria I. Quezada) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 74; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 74; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 74; Hearing on Motion to Dismiss - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Dismiss; Case Management Conference; Ord...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Rafael David Miranda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal; Filed by Rafael David Miranda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Rafael David Miranda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Rafael David Miranda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Rafael David Miranda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
182 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Rafael David Miranda (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE TO REAL PROPERTY & JURY DEMAND FOR: (1) BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC697314    Hearing Date: March 17, 2020    Dept: 74

If you are not submitting on the tentative and not intending to appear via CourtCall, the hearing on this matter will be continued.

BC697314 RAFAEL DAVID MIRANDA VS ANDRES CONTRERAS

Defendant’s Motion to Set Aside Default and Quash Service of Summons

TENTATIVE RULING: Illness of an attorney is good cause to grant a continuance. The ex parte application to continue this hearing is granted. The hearing is continued to April 16, 2020. Plaintiff may file an opposition and defendant Contreras may file a reply, per code.