This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2022 at 23:17:29 (UTC).

RAFAEL ARROYO VS RIO VISTA DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Case Summary

On 11/08/2021 RAFAEL ARROYO filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against RIO VISTA DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. STEWART. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0962

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM D. STEWART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARROYO RAFAEL

Defendant

RIO VISTA DEVELOPMENT COMPANY A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP DBA THE GARLAND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BALLISTER RAYMOND GEORGE JR

Defendant Attorney

MARETZ PETER B.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/8/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/8/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/8/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/24/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Mail

11/12/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

12/29/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Answer

12/29/2021: Answer

Request for Dismissal

3/30/2022: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

3/21/2022: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Mail

3/17/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement

3/17/2022: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal

4/4/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/4/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Rafael Arroyo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Rafael Arroyo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Rafael Arroyo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Rio Vista Development Company, a California Limited Partnership (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Rio Vista Development Company, a California Limited Partnership (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, William D. Stewart, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Rio Vista Development Company, a California Limited Partnership (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Rio Vista Development Company, a California Limited Partnership (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Rafael Arroyo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Rafael Arroyo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rafael Arroyo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rafael Arroyo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rafael Arroyo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less