This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/25/2021 at 22:29:23 (UTC).

RADIUM2 CAPITAL, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS NELSON SARGSYAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 RADIUM2 CAPITAL, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed an Other - Sister State Judgment lawsuit against NELSON SARGSYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1003

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Sister State Judgment

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RADIUM2 CAPITAL LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

HDA TRUCKING LLC

SARGSYAN NELSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERKE MICHAEL N.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Application for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment

4/2/2021: Application for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment

Judgment

4/2/2021: Judgment

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY ON SISTER STATE JUDGMENT

4/2/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ENTRY ON SISTER STATE JUDGMENT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/8/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/8/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Radium2 Capital, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Radium2 Capital, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Entry on Sister State Judgment); Filed by Radium2 Capital, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketApplication for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment; Filed by Radium2 Capital, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Radium2 Capital, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RADIUM2 CAPITAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERKE MICHAEL N