Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/04/2020 at 05:25:34 (UTC).

RADFORD EUGENE SPENCER VS HENSEL PHELPS CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 RADFORD EUGENE SPENCER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HENSEL PHELPS CONSTRUCTION COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0986

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPENCER RADFORD EUGENE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DOE 1 DBA HENSEL PHELPS CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

HENSEL PHELPS CONSTRUCTION COMPANY

DOE 4

DOE 9

DOE 8

HENSEL PHELPS

DOE 3

HENSEL PHELPS INC.

DOE 2

DOE 7

DOE 6

DOE 10

DOE 11 THRU 150

DOE 5

Cross Defendant

MOES 1 THROUGH 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUDMAN JEFFREY ALAN

Defendant Attorney

KIRWAN SONDRA

 

Court Documents

Cross-Complaint

5/27/2020: Cross-Complaint

Answer

5/27/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

4/16/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/16/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

3/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

3/24/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/18/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/18/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2023
  • Hearing03/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • Hearing09/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • Hearing09/01/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Hensel Phelps Construction Co. Erroneously Sued As Hensel Phelps, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Hensel Phelps Construction Co. Erroneously Sued As Hensel Phelps, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Radford Eugene Spencer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Radford Eugene Spencer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Radford Eugene Spencer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Radford Eugene Spencer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Radford Eugene Spencer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HENSEL PHELPS CONSTRUCTION CO. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUDMAN JEFFREY ALAN ESQ.