This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/14/2023 at 19:52:13 (UTC).

RACHEL RAMIREZ VS LYFT, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/05/2020 RACHEL RAMIREZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LYFT, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are AUDRA MORI, WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7162

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

AUDRA MORI

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMIREZ RACHEL

Defendants

LYFT INC.

COMBS DAVID ALIAS DAVID COMBS

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. ALIAS UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRANNIS FRED

Defendant Attorney

FIOLA N. ASIR

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

6/10/2022: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES FOR ALL PURP...)

6/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES FOR ALL PURP...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES FOR ALL PURP...)]

6/8/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES FOR ALL PURP...)]

Notice of Related Case

11/10/2021: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

11/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 11/24/2021

11/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 11/24/2021

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT LYFT, INC. EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DEADLINES, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO SHORTEN TIME

10/26/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT LYFT, INC. EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AND ALL RELATED DEADLINES, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO SHORTEN TIME

Notice of Ruling

10/27/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE)

10/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE)

Proof of Personal Service

12/10/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Substitution of Attorney

1/19/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Personal Service

3/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Demand for Jury Trial

4/23/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

4/23/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AN...)

6/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AN...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AN...)

6/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE AN...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DEADLINES

6/30/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DEADLINES

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL AND HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATIONS

7/1/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL AND HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATIONS

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing: Status Date changed from 05/13/2022 to 06/10/2022; As To Parties: removed; Status changed from Rejected to Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Court Order Re: Stipulation to Consolidate Cases for All Purp...)]; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Stipulation to Consolidate Cases for All Purp...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 05/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 06/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Final Status Conference scheduled for 08/24/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 06/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 06/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 07/19/2022 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 06/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketCase numbers 20STCV15684, and 20STCV17162 consolidated; case number 20STCV15684 is the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 27 - Hon. William A. Crowfoot

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCase numbers 20STCV15684, 20STCV17162 are related; case number 20STCV15684 is the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 10/19/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 05/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Rachel Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Rachel Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Rachel Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Lyft, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas D. Long in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less