This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/02/2021 at 08:49:50 (UTC).

RACHEL NICHOLS VS FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/09/2020 RACHEL NICHOLS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3880

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NICHOLS RACHEL

Defendants

SALUD PRISCILLA

FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FREEDMAN ERIC MATTHEW

FREEDMAN ERIC

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/10/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/9/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/4/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/4/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

4/30/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER;) OF 04/30/2020

4/30/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER;) OF 04/30/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER;)

4/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER;)

Notice - NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND PLAINTIFF OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT

5/14/2020: Notice - NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND PLAINTIFF OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

4/28/2020: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/24/2020

8/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/24/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • Docketat 12:25 PM in Department 56; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/24/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketNotice (to State Court and Plaintiff of Removal of Action to the United States District Court); Filed by Freedom Mortgage Corporation (Defendant); Priscilla Salud (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • Docketat 2:08 PM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: peremptory challenge to judicial officer;) of 04/30/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: peremptory challenge to judicial officer;)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Rachel Nichols (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Rachel Nichols (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rachel Nichols (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rachel Nichols (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rachel Nichols (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less