This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/08/2021 at 17:11:12 (UTC).

RACHEL MARTIN, AN INDIVIDUAL VS SYLVESTER HARRIS, JR, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HARRIS TRUST, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 RACHEL MARTIN, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SYLVESTER HARRIS, JR, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HARRIS TRUST. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH ANN KWAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9564

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUTH ANN KWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARTIN AN INDIVIDUAL RACHEL

MARTIN RACHEL

Defendants

HARRIS JR AS TRUSTEE OF THE HARRIS TRUST SYLVESTER

HARRIS JR AS TRUSTEE OF THE HARRIS TRUST DEBRA

HARRIS SYLVESTER JR. AS TRUSTEE

HARRIS AS TRUSTEE DEBRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BRINTON MATTHEW

BRINTON MATTHEW L.

Defendant Attorney

BOWMAN STANLEY D.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/7/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE MARTIN NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

6/11/2021: Notice - NOTICE MARTIN NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/13/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

4/13/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/14/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/27/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/3/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Proof of Personal Service

2/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/16/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ANSWERS;)

2/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ANSWERS;)

Answer

1/27/2021: Answer

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/14/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/14/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS AMENDED

12/30/2020: Summons - SUMMONS AMENDED

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/28/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/28/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • Hearing08/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • Hearing08/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketNotice (Martin Notice of Case Reassignment); Filed by Rachel Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 72; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Rachel Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Sylvester Harris, Jr. as Trustee (Defendant); Debra Harris, as Trustee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Rachel Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Rachel Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Sylvester Harris, Jr. as Trustee (Defendant); Debra Harris, as Trustee (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketSummons (AMENDED); Filed by Rachel Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Rachel Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Rachel Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Rachel Martin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARRIS AS TRUSTEE DEBRA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOWMAN STANLEY D.