This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/31/2023 at 19:28:39 (UTC).

RACHEL KYLIAN, ET AL. VS INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP RESOURCES, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/08/2022 RACHEL KYLIAN, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP RESOURCES, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1450

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KYLIAN RACHEL

MAHALET YONAS A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM MANDY POLLAK

POLLAK MANDY

Defendant

INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP RESOURCES LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HALL TIMOTHY A.

HALL TIMOTHY A

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/8/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/8/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint - COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. STATUTORY MISAPPROPRIATION OF PUBLICITY (CIVIL CODE SECTION 3344) 2. COMMON LAW MISAPPROPRIATION OF PUBLICITY

12/8/2022: Complaint - COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. STATUTORY MISAPPROPRIATION OF PUBLICITY (CIVIL CODE SECTION 3344) 2. COMMON LAW MISAPPROPRIATION OF PUBLICITY

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

12/14/2022: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/14/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM; NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING

12/21/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM; NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2023
  • Hearing07/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Failure to Prosecute; Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2023
  • Hearing07/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Failure to Prosecute; Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement scheduled for 07/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gary Y. Tanaka in Department B Torrance Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. STATUTORY MISAPPROPRIATION OF PUBLICITY (CIVIL CODE SECTION 3344) 2. COMMON LAW MISAPPROPRIATION OF PUBLICITY; Filed by: RACHEL KYLIAN (Plaintiff); MAHALET YONAS, a minor, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem MANDY POLLAK (Plaintiff); As to: INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP RESOURCES, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: RACHEL KYLIAN (Plaintiff); MAHALET YONAS, a minor, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem MANDY POLLAK (Plaintiff); As to: INTERCONTINENTAL HOTELS GROUP RESOURCES, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less