This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/08/2023 at 09:05:33 (UTC).

RACHEL GRADSTEIN VS DEAN K. MATSUDA, MD

Case Summary

On 03/15/2022 RACHEL GRADSTEIN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against DEAN K MATSUDA, MD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9078

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRADSTEIN RACHEL

Defendant

MATSUDA MD DEAN K.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRADSTEIN HENRY

Defendant Attorney

BRADFORD THOMAS ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

3/15/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

3/15/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/15/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/15/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/15/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

3/15/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

3/15/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/15/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

3/15/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/15/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/4/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

5/4/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

Demand for Jury Trial

5/4/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

5/4/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

4/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Change of Firm Name

12/21/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Name

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2025
  • Hearing03/11/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2023
  • Hearing09/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • Hearing08/29/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Thomas Robert Bradford (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Peterson Bradford Burkwitz to Peterson, Bradford, Burkwitz, Gregorio, Burkwitz & Su, LLP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by: Dean K. Matsuda, MD (Defendant); New Firm Name: Peterson, Bradford, Burkwitz, Gregorio, Burkwitz & Su, LLP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Dean K. Matsuda, MD (Defendant); As to: Rachel Gradstein (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of Trial Attorney; Filed by: Dean K. Matsuda, MD (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Dean K. Matsuda, MD (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Dean K. Matsuda, MD (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Rachel Gradstein (Plaintiff); As to: Dean K. Matsuda, MD (Defendant); Service Date: 04/18/2022; Service Cost: 190.40; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Rachel Gradstein (Plaintiff); As to: Dean K. Matsuda, MD (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Audra Mori in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Rachel Gradstein (Plaintiff); As to: Dean K. Matsuda, MD (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less