This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2021 at 00:03:15 (UTC).

RACHEL ASHBY VS RESTORE HEALTH AND WELLNESS CENTER, LLC, A CALIFORNIA COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/12/2020 RACHEL ASHBY filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against RESTORE HEALTH AND WELLNESS CENTER, LLC, A CALIFORNIA COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON and ARMEN TAMZARIAN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7968

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

ARMEN TAMZARIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASHBY RACHEL

Defendant

RESTORE HEALTH AND WELLNESS CENTER LLC A CALIFORNIA COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BYRNES CRAIG T.

BYRNES CRAIG TRENT

Defendant Attorneys

DARROLL EILEEN

DARROLL EILEEN PALMER

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 06/07/2021

6/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 06/07/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

6/16/2021: Notice of Ruling

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 05/04/2021

5/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 05/04/2021

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 04/19/2021

4/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 04/19/2021

Notice - NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

9/8/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) DEMU...)

8/26/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) DEMU...)

Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT

8/17/2020: Reply - REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

6/25/2020: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF EILEEN P. DARROLL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE

6/25/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF EILEEN P. DARROLL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE;)

6/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE;)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

6/29/2020: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE;) OF 06/29/2020

6/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE;) OF 06/29/2020

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

6/29/2020: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)]

7/7/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)]

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/15/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/12/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/12/2020: Complaint

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Jury Trial ((12 days)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (for failure to prosecute) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Jury Trial (12 days); Final Status Conference; Order to Show ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by RESTORE HEALTH AND WELLNESS CENTER, LLC, a California company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by RESTORE HEALTH AND WELLNESS CENTER, LLC, a California company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Eileen P. Darroll in Support of Defendant's Demurrer to Complaint and Motion to Strike); Filed by RESTORE HEALTH AND WELLNESS CENTER, LLC, a California company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by RACHEL ASHBY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by RACHEL ASHBY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by RACHEL ASHBY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BYRNES, CRAIG T.