This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/05/2023 at 13:08:15 (UTC).

RACHAEL WENDEL ET AL VS MARIN MARQUEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/07/2017 RACHAEL WENDEL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARIN MARQUEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6002

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WENDEL TIMOTHY

WENDEL RACHAEL

Defendants

STAR TRUCKING INC LONE

STYLINE LOGISTICS INC.

LONE STAR TRUCKING GROUP INC.

STYLINE TRANSPORTATION INC.

OFS BRANDS INC.

LONE STAR TRUCKING LLC

MARQUEZ MARIN

LOGISTICS STYLINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TANNENBAUM OZ

Defendant Attorneys

KIEFER MARK

MCNAMARA KEVIN P

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

1/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 01/15/2021

1/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 01/15/2021

Request for Dismissal

12/11/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

11/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 11/06/2020

11/6/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 11/06/2020

Notice of Settlement

11/2/2020: Notice of Settlement

Separate Statement

9/17/2020: Separate Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/17/2020: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING EXHIBITS

9/17/2020: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING EXHIBITS

Motion for Summary Judgment

9/17/2020: Motion for Summary Judgment

Request for Judicial Notice

9/17/2020: Request for Judicial Notice

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROYCE HUANG

9/17/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROYCE HUANG

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANTS STYLINE LIGISTICES, INC. AND MARIN MARQUEZ'S MOTIO...)

8/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFENDANTS STYLINE LIGISTICES, INC. AND MARIN MARQUEZ'S MOTIO...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING RE MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

8/24/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING RE MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

Informal Discovery Conference

7/29/2020: Informal Discovery Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

7/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

7/29/2020: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUING INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE) OF 06/02/2020

6/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUING INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE) OF 06/02/2020

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 01/15/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketAddress for Mark Kiefer (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 02/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by RACHAEL WENDEL ET AL on 12/07/2017, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Rachael Wendel and Timothy Wendel as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 02/02/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of 11/06/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketAddress for Oz Tannenbaum (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 11/06/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
95 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Rachael Wendel (Plaintiff); As to: Marin Marquez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/15/2018; Service Cost: 148.24; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service Of Summons; Filed by: Rachael Wendel (Plaintiff); As to: Marin Marquez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/15/2018; Service Cost: 268.24; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketProof Of Service Of Summons; Filed by: Rachael Wendel (Plaintiff); As to: Marin Marquez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/14/2018; Service Cost: 58.26; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Rachael Wendel (Plaintiff); Timothy Wendel (Plaintiff); As to: Lone Star Trucking, LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 11/13/2018; Service Cost: 137.13; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Rachael Wendel (Plaintiff); Timothy Wendel (Plaintiff); As to: Star Trucking Inc Lone (Defendant); Service Date: 11/13/2018; Service Cost: 52.13; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:Final Status Conference 05/23/19 at 10:00 am Dennis J. Landin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:Jury Trial 06/07/19 at 8:30 am Dennis J. Landin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:OSC RE Dismissal 12/07/20 at 8:30 am Dennis J. Landin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Motor Vehicle - PI/PD/WD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****6002    Hearing Date: August 24, 2020    Dept: 28

Motion to Continue Trial and Related Dates

Having considered the moving papers, the Court rules as follows.

BACKGROUND

On December 7, 2017, Plaintiffs Rachael Wendel and Timothy Wendel (collectively “Plaintiffs”) filed a complaint against Defendants Styline Logistics, Inc., Styline Transportation, Inc., Styline Logistics, OFS Brands Inc., Star Trucking Inc. Lone, Lone Star Trucking Group, Inc., and Marin Marquez.  Plaintiffs allege motor vehicle negligence and loss of consortium in the complaint arising from an incident involving an automobile on December 8, 2015.

On February 13, 2020, Defendants Styline Logistics, Inc. dba Styline Logistics and Marin Marquez filed a motion to continue trial pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 3.1332.

On February 24, 2020, the Court continued the hearing on the motion to March 26, 2020.

On March 18, 2020, the Court continued the hearing on the motion to May 29, 2020.

On April 21, 2020, the Court continued the hearing on the motion to August 24, 2020.

An Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal is scheduled for December 7, 2020.

PARTIES’ REQUESTS

Defendants Styline Logistics, Inc. dba Styline Logistics and Marin Marquez (“Moving Defendants”) ask the Court to continue trial to September 21, 2020 and the final status conference to September 9, 2020, relating all discovery cut of dates to relate to the September 21, 2020 trial date.

LEGAL STANDARD

Pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 3.1332, subdivision (a), “[t]o ensure the prompt disposition of civil cases, the dates assigned for a trial are firm.  All parties and their counsel must regard the date set for trial as certain.”  Under California Rules of Court, rule 3.1332, subdivision (b), “[a] party seeking a continuance of the date set for trial, whether contested or uncontested or stipulated to by the parties, must make the request for a continuance by a noticed motion or an ex parte application under the rules in chapter 4 of this division, with supporting declarations.  The party must make the motion or application as soon as reasonably practical once the necessity for the continuance is discovered.”

California Rules of Court, rule 3.1332, subdivision (c) states that “[a]lthough continuances of trials are disfavored, each request for a continuance must be considered on its own merits.  The court may grant a continuance only on an affirmative showing of good cause requiring the continuance.”  California Rules of Court, rule 3.1332, subdivision (d) sets forth factors that are relevant in determining whether to grant a continuance.

California Code of Civil Procedure section 2024.050 allows a court to grant leave to complete discovery proceedings.  In doing so, a court shall consider matters relevant to the leave requested, including, but not limited to: (1) the necessity of the discovery, (2) the diligence in seeking the discovery or discovery motion, (3) the likelihood of interference with the trial calendar or prejudice to a party, and (4) the length of time that has elapsed between previous trial dates.  (Code Civ. Proc. ; 2024.050.)

DISCUSSION

The Court vacated trial and related dates on March 18, 2020 after Moving Defendants filed the instant motion..  Trial is not currently set.  As such, the motion is moot.

CONCLUSION

The motion is DENIED as MOOT.  Nonetheless, rather than require the parties to appear for a later trial setting, the court sets the matter for trial on April 30, 2021 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 28 and for Final Status Conference on April 16, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 28.  The parties may appear at the August 24, 2020 hearing of this matter if these dates conflict with any party or party’s counsel’s calendar.  

Moving Defendant is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

The parties are directed to the header of this tentative ruling for further instructions.