Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/12/2021 at 13:54:12 (UTC).

R. S., JR., ET AL. VS WILLIAM S. HART UNION HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY

Case Summary

On 06/26/2020 R S , JR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WILLIAM S HART UNION HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT, A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4311

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMITH ROSE

Defendant

WILLIAM S. HART UNION HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT A PUBLIC ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

POULTER BRIAN LEE

HAROUTOUNIAN ALLEN GABRIEL

RUGA DYLAN

Defendant Attorney

DUMONT LOUIS R

 

Court Documents

Answer

10/14/2020: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/28/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR R.S. JR.

8/7/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR R.S. JR.

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/10/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/26/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/26/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/26/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/26/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

6/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURE AND HEARING DATES

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

6/29/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

PI General Order

6/29/2020: PI General Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2023
  • Hearing06/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • Hearing12/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • Hearing12/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by William S. Hart Union High School District, a public entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by R. S., JR. (Plaintiff); Rose Smith (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by R. S., JR. (Plaintiff); Rose Smith (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for R.S. Jr.); Filed by R. S., JR. (Plaintiff); Rose Smith (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for R.S.); Filed by R. S., JR. (Plaintiff); Rose Smith (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedure and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by R. S., JR. (Plaintiff); Rose Smith (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by R. S., JR. (Plaintiff); Rose Smith (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by R. S., JR. (Plaintiff); Rose Smith (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WILLIAM S. HART UNION HIGH SCHOOL DISTRICT A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAROUTOUNIAN ALLEN GABRIEL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer POULTER BRIAN LEE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUGA DYLAN