This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 10:05:59 (UTC).

R REX PARRIS LAW FIRM LLP VS VEATCH CARLSON LLP

Case Summary

On 09/07/2017 R REX PARRIS LAW FIRM LLP filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against VEATCH CARLSON LLP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5022

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

R.REX PARRIS LAW FIRM LLP

Defendant

CARLSON VEATCH LLP

Not Classified By Court

NEVIN LAW FIRM P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WILSON ERIC NATHAN

PARRIS KHAIL A.

WHEELER ALEXANDER RUSSELL

Defendant Attorneys

TRAUT JAMES RUSSELL ESQ.

MACKEY ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Application

10/9/2018: Ex Parte Application

Order

10/9/2018: Order

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

10/9/2018: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order

10/23/2018: Minute Order

Notice

10/30/2018: Notice

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

11/9/2018: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Minute Order

11/9/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

11/13/2018: Notice of Ruling

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

11/20/2018: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

11/20/2018: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Substitution of Attorney

11/27/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

12/3/2018: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Ex Parte Application

12/3/2018: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

12/3/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

12/14/2018: Minute Order

Declaration

12/17/2018: Declaration

Opposition

12/26/2018: Opposition

Opposition

12/26/2018: Opposition

117 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Reconsideration - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Judgment (CCP 473.5)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by R.REX PARRIS LAW FIRM LLP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by R.REX PARRIS LAW FIRM LLP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by R.REX PARRIS LAW FIRM LLP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
240 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by R.REX PARRIS LAW FIRM LLP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CARLSON, VEATCH LLP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by R.REX PARRIS LAW FIRM LLP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by R.REX PARRIS LAW FIRM LLP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILSON ERIC NATHAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARRIS KHAIL A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHEELER ALEXANDER RUSSELL