This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/25/2023 at 02:07:03 (UTC).

R. BRUCE KEINER, ET AL. VS TREVOR DAMYAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/17/2022 R BRUCE KEINER, filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against TREVOR DAMYAN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6126

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

KEINER ALEXIS M.

KEINER R. BRUCE

KEINER SUELLEN T.

KEINER WILLIAM G

GUARANTEED RATE INC. DBA

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC.

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

DAMYAN TREVOR

URBAN PROFESSIONAL BUILDERS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DONE RIGHT HOME REMODELING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOOTTON CHAD B.

Defendant Attorney

DERBY PAUL BRENTWOOD

Cross Defendant Attorneys

MCELROY JESSICA A.

HEPWORTH JAMES D.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAI...)

3/16/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAI...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAI...) OF 03/16/2023

3/16/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAI...) OF 03/16/2023

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JAMES HEPWORTH

3/15/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF JAMES HEPWORTH

Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION DECLARATION FOR TREVOR DAMYAN

3/15/2023: Supplemental Declaration - SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION DECLARATION FOR TREVOR DAMYAN

Notice of Ruling

3/6/2023: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAI...)

2/28/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAI...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAI...) OF 02/28/2023

2/28/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS FOR DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAI...) OF 02/28/2023

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

2/17/2023: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Separate Statement

2/17/2023: Separate Statement

Separate Statement

2/17/2023: Separate Statement

Separate Statement

2/17/2023: Separate Statement

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JAMES D. HEPWORTH

2/17/2023: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JAMES D. HEPWORTH

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

2/17/2023: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

2/17/2023: Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

Separate Statement

2/17/2023: Separate Statement

Case Management Statement

2/6/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/6/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF RULING

2/1/2023: Notice - NOTICE AMENDED NOTICE OF RULING

81 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2024
  • Hearing03/04/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2024
  • Hearing02/15/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2024
  • Hearing02/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2023
  • Hearing10/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2023
  • Hearing10/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2023
  • Hearing10/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • Hearing08/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions for Defendant/Cross-Complai...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions for Defendant/Cross-Complai...) of 03/16/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: sanctions for Defendant/Cross-Complainant's failure to appear today 02/28/2023 scheduled for 03/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 03/16/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
140 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 26 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: R. Bruce Keiner (Plaintiff); Suellen T. Keiner (Plaintiff); William G Keiner (Plaintiff); Alexis M. Keiner (Plaintiff); As to: Trevor Damyan (Defendant); RIGHT HOME REMODELING, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: R. Bruce Keiner (Plaintiff); Suellen T. Keiner (Plaintiff); William G Keiner (Plaintiff); Alexis M. Keiner (Plaintiff); As to: Trevor Damyan (Defendant); RIGHT HOME REMODELING, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: R. Bruce Keiner (Plaintiff); Suellen T. Keiner (Plaintiff); William G Keiner (Plaintiff); Alexis M. Keiner (Plaintiff); As to: Trevor Damyan (Defendant); RIGHT HOME REMODELING, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less