This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/04/2021 at 09:07:42 (UTC).

QUINTO, BECKY ANN VS FARRIS, JULIA

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 QUINTO, BECKY ANN filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against FARRIS, JULIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BOSLEY, GIA G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0797

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BOSLEY, GIA G

 

Party Details

Petitioner

QUINTO BECKY ANN

Respondent

FARRIS JULIA

 

Court Documents

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

12/11/2020: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Response - Civil Harassment

12/11/2020: Response - Civil Harassment

Proof of Service - of Response

12/14/2020: Proof of Service - of Response

Minute Order

12/17/2020: Minute Order

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

11/30/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Granted

11/30/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Granted

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition - Civil Harassment

11/30/2020: Petition - Civil Harassment

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

11/30/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 11, Bosley, Gia G, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Denied - RO- After Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (of Response ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketResponse - Civil Harassment; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (Granted ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less