This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/18/2021 at 07:14:26 (UTC).

QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORP. VS ARAM BAGRAMYAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/09/2020 QUINN RENTAL SERVICES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ARAM BAGRAMYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0364

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QUINN RENTAL SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORP.

Defendants

SV GENERAL CONTRACTOR INC. A CALIF. CORP.

1008 OGDEN LLC A CALIF. LLC

BAGRAMYAN ARAM

VAQUERANO SANTOS ROMEO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POLICAR RAY

Defendant Attorney

VARGAS BRENDA ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

1/11/2021: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/12/2021

1/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 01/12/2021

Request for Judicial Notice

11/20/2020: Request for Judicial Notice

Trial Brief

11/20/2020: Trial Brief

Witness List

11/20/2020: Witness List

Trial Brief

11/30/2020: Trial Brief

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

9/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

8/27/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/10/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Answer

6/1/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

5/27/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/27/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/27/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

5/1/2020: Request for Dismissal

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/9/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/9/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • Hearing09/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department M; Non-Jury Trial ((1 hour estimate)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docketat 2:43 PM in Department M; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/12/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Quinn Rental Services, Inc., a California corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department M; Non-Jury Trial ((1 hour estimate)) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department M; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by SV General Contractor Inc., a Calif. corp. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SV General Contractor Inc., a Calif. corp. (Defendant); Santos Romeo Vaquerano (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Quinn Rental Services, Inc., a California corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Quinn Rental Services, Inc., a California corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Quinn Rental Services, Inc., a California corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Quinn Rental Services, Inc., a California corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Quinn Rental Services, Inc., a California corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Quinn Rental Services, Inc., a California corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Quinn Rental Services, Inc., a California corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QUINN RENTAL SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer POLICAR RAY