This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2021 at 18:46:53 (UTC).

QUINCY T STINSON VS GENERAL MOTORS, LLC, A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 QUINCY T STINSON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS, LLC, A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5017

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STINSON QUINCY T

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ABRAMS KATHRYN BETH

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

7/12/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 69 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATION

7/14/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 69 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATION

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/14/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/8/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/8/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/8/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • Hearing11/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 69 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Department 69 Online Courtroom Information); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Quincy T Stinson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Quincy T Stinson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Quincy T Stinson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Quincy T Stinson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ABRAMS KATHRYN B.