Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/29/2021 at 14:39:06 (UTC).

QUARANTA, PAULINA VS QUARANTA, ANGELO

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 QUARANTA, PAULINA filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against QUARANTA, ANGELO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SWIFT, DAVID W. and ELLIS, STEVEN A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0603

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SWIFT, DAVID W.

ELLIS, STEVEN A.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

QUARANTA PAULINA

Respondent

QUARANTA ANGELO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CATENA ANTHONY JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

FCS - Agreement

3/2/2021: FCS - Agreement

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

3/24/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Response - Domestic Violence

3/17/2021: Response - Domestic Violence

Declaration - Income and Expense

3/17/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Proof of Service - Mail

3/22/2021: Proof of Service - Mail

Minute Order

3/24/2021: Minute Order

Proof of Service - Electronic - Roxanner L. Hernanderz, Esq. on behalf of Angelo Quaranta

2/26/2021: Proof of Service - Electronic - Roxanner L. Hernanderz, Esq. on behalf of Angelo Quaranta

Declaration - Income and Expense

2/26/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

3/2/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Corrections - - DV-140 #2 Corrected to Reflect Other Parents Name

2/23/2021: Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Corrections - - DV-140 #2 Corrected to Reflect Other Parents Name

Minute Order

3/2/2021: Minute Order

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - - Amended 02/23/21

2/5/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - - Amended 02/23/21

Proof of Completion - OUR CHILDREN FIRST

2/17/2021: Proof of Completion - OUR CHILDREN FIRST

FCS-Mediation Memo

2/18/2021: FCS-Mediation Memo

Proof of Service

2/22/2021: Proof of Service

Request - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation)

2/5/2021: Request - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

2/5/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

2/5/2021: FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2C, Ellis, Steven A., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 25, Swift, David W., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketClerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Corrections (- DV-140 #2 Corrected to Reflect Other Parents Name )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Completion (OUR CHILDREN FIRST ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (- Amended 02/23/21 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CATENA ANTHONY JOSEPH