This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2020 at 21:23:13 (UTC).

QUANNICE THOMPSON ET AL VS GARY A EPPS ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/22/2018 QUANNICE THOMPSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GARY A EPPS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK and KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1025

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Guardian Ad Litem

THOMPSON QUANNICE

Defendants and Respondents

EPPS CLARISSA L.

EPPS GARY A.

DOES 1 TO 200

Minor

BROOKS ALISE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor, Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

TOWNSLEY CHRISTOPHER B. ESQ.

JOHNSON STEPHEN M.

JOHNSON STEPHEN MICHAEL ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

MARK R. WEINER & ASSOCIATES

SALDO JESSICA A. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

1/9/2020: Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); ORDER TO SHOW...) OF 12/11/2019

12/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); ORDER TO SHOW...) OF 12/11/2019

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); ORDER TO SHOW...)

12/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); ORDER TO SHOW...)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER ON EXPEDITED PETITION TO CONFIRM COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM

11/14/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER ON EXPEDITED PETITION TO CONFIRM COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

11/12/2019: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITONER/GUARDIAN AD LITEM, QUANNICE THOMPSON'S E...)

11/12/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITONER/GUARDIAN AD LITEM, QUANNICE THOMPSON'S E...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON EXPEDITED PETITION TO CONFIRM COMPROMISE OF DISPUT...) OF 10/09/2019

10/9/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON EXPEDITED PETITION TO CONFIRM COMPROMISE OF DISPUT...) OF 10/09/2019

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PRO

9/18/2019: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PRO

Request for Refund / Order

5/21/2019: Request for Refund / Order

Notice of Settlement

7/17/2019: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/6/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Deposit - Jury

3/4/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

6/8/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

6/8/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -

6/8/2018: NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT - CIVIL -

SUMMONS -

3/29/2018: SUMMONS -

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

2/20/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1. NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

1/22/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1. NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Compliance - Proof of Deposit of Monies Into Blocked Account) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Quannice Thompson (Plaintiff); Alise Brooks, a Minor, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Quannice Thompson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Alise Brooks, a Minor, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Quannice Thompson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2; Order to Show Cause Re: (Compliance - Proof of Deposit of Monies Into Blocked Account) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement); Order to Show...) of 12/11/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement); Order to Show...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Order on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise of Disputed Claim); Filed by Quannice Thompson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2; Hearing on Expedited Petition to Confirm Compromise (of Disputed Claim As To Minor Claimant, Alise Broooks;) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS GARY A. EPPS AND CLARISSA L. EPPS; DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Gary A. Epps (Defendant); Clarissa L. Epps (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Gary A. Epps (Defendant); Clarissa L. Epps (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Quannice Thompson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1. NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC691025    Hearing Date: November 12, 2019    Dept: 2

Thompson, et al. v. Epps, et al.

The court has reviewed the Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim of a Minor and Person With a Disability (Alise Brooks, Age 12), filed on 9/18/19 and the Supplemental Declaration of Stephen M. Johnson filed on 11/1/19.

The court finds that the settlement is reasonable and GRANTS the petition and distribution of the settlement fund s follows:

Attorney’s fees (25%)

$2,500.00

Medical expenses

1,103.45

Costs

3,239.81

Total

$6,843.26

Gross settlement

$10,000.00

Less fees, costs, and expenses

-6,843.26

Total for deposit into blocked account

$3,156.74

THE COURT SETS AN OSC RE Proof of Deposit on 03/09/2020. at 8:30 a.m.

The OSC RE  Dismissal set for 12/11/2019 is advanced and continued to 03/09/2020 at 8:30 a.m.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.