Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2019 at 02:01:33 (UTC).

QUALITY LOAN SERVICE SERVICE CORP. VS. 10048 KEOKUK AVENUE

Case Summary

On 09/21/2018 QUALITY LOAN SERVICE SERVICE CORP filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against 10048 KEOKUK AVENUE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0010

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORP.

Respondent

10048 KEOKUK AVENUE

Not Classified By Court

TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

HARRIS SETH

RAZI-JAFARI JEFFREY SEPEHR

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

10/18/2018: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice

11/16/2018: Notice

Notice

9/21/2018: Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/21/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds

9/21/2018: Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds

Notice

9/21/2018: Notice

Other -

10/1/2018: Other -

Order to Deposit

10/1/2018: Order to Deposit

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2018
  • Notice (of Entry of Order to Deposit Surplus Funds Pursuant to Cal. Civ. Code ss02924j(c)&(d)); Filed by QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORP. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Jeffrey Sepehr Razi-Jafari (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Order to Deposit (named extension) SURPLUS FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Notice DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Petition filed-No Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Notice DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEST PARTY FOR TRUST CONVERSION is a litigant

Latest cases where Quality Loan Service Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Harris, Seth

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAZI-JAFARI JEFFREY