Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2021 at 01:15:02 (UTC).

QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORP. VS ALL CLAIMANTS TO SURPLUS FUNDS

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORP filed an Other lawsuit against ALL CLAIMANTS TO SURPLUS FUNDS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0971

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORP.

Respondents and Not Classified By Court

ALL CLAIMANTS TO SURPLUS FUNDS

STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

PODMENIK MATTHEW

PODMENIK MATTHEW E.

Respondent and Not Classified By Court Attorney

THOMPSON MICHELE

 

Court Documents

Motion re: - MOTION RE: MOTION TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS AND DISCHARGE PETITIONER

6/3/2021: Motion re: - MOTION RE: MOTION TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS AND DISCHARGE PETITIONER

Response to Petition - RESPONSE TO PETITION STATE OF CALIFORNIA FIWNCHISE TAX BOARD'S CLAIM TO SURPI,US FUNDS

5/14/2021: Response to Petition - RESPONSE TO PETITION STATE OF CALIFORNIA FIWNCHISE TAX BOARD'S CLAIM TO SURPI,US FUNDS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 05/19/2021

5/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 05/19/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

5/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

4/7/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

3/30/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

Notice of Status Conference and Order

3/30/2021: Notice of Status Conference and Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds - PETITION AND DECLARATION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAIMS AND DEPOSIT OF UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS

3/26/2021: Petition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds - PETITION AND DECLARATION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAIMS AND DEPOSIT OF UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • Hearing07/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion - Other Motion to Discharge Petitioner and Deposit Surplus Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketMotion re: (Motion to Deposit Surplus Funds and Discharge Petitioner); Filed by Quality Loan Service Corp. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • Docketat 11:34 AM in Department 56; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 05/19/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketResponse to Petition (STATE OF CALIFORNIA FIWNCHISE TAX BOARD'S CLAIM TO SURPI,US FUNDS); Filed by State of California Franchise Tax Board (Respondent); State of California Franchise Tax Board (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Status Conference and Order); Filed by Quality Loan Service Corp. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Case Assignment); Filed by Quality Loan Service Corp. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Quality Loan Service Corp. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketPetition and Declaration Regarding Unresolved Claims and Deposit of Undistributed Surplus Proceeds of Trustee's Sale; Filed by Quality Loan Service Corp. (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Quality Loan Service Corporation is a litigant