This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 10:16:38 (UTC).

QIUHENG LIAO VS. XPO GF AMERICA, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/28/2017 QIUHENG LIAO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against XPO GF AMERICA, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MAURICE A. LEITER and WILLIAM BARRY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8841

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MAURICE A. LEITER

WILLIAM BARRY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

LIA QIUHENG

LIAO QIUHENG

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

DOES 1-20

NDO AMERICA INC.

SOLORIO ARMANDO

XPO GF AMERICA INC.

LIAO QIUHENG

Other

LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT

Not Classified By Court

CLAVESILLA DENISE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TAM AVERY

TAM AVERY HO-YUAN

CHAMI POUYA

RAVIPUDI RAHUL

Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

SABA RYAN DONALD

HOFFMAN MARK S.

 

Court Documents

Brief

6/13/2019: Brief

Legacy Document

4/19/2018: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

4/20/2018: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

4/26/2018: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

4/27/2018: Legacy Document

Minute Order

5/3/2018: Minute Order

Brief

5/14/2018: Brief

Brief

5/14/2018: Brief

Minute Order

5/16/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

5/17/2018: Notice of Ruling

Notice

10/11/2018: Notice

Brief

10/22/2018: Brief

Brief

10/23/2018: Brief

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/25/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Brief

12/6/2018: Brief

Minute Order

12/21/2018: Minute Order

Notice

12/21/2018: Notice

Stipulation and Order

2/27/2019: Stipulation and Order

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by QIUHENG LIAO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Association of Attorney; Filed by QIUHENG LIAO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Motion for Order (XPO's Motion to Disqualify); Filed by XPO GF AMERICA, INC. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Brief (Compendium of Evidence Submitted ISO Defendant XPO GF America Inc.'s MSA.pdf); Filed by XPO GF AMERICA, INC. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Separate Statement (OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT XPO GF AMERICA); Filed by XPO GF AMERICA, INC. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by XPO GF AMERICA, INC. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend (Cross-Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (XPO'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE, OR, ALTERNATIVELY, TO SHORTEN TIME TO HEAR XPO'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION AND SPECIALLY-SETTING THE HEARING ON XPO'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION LESS THAN THIRTY DAYS PRIOR TO TRIAL) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by XPO GF AMERICA, INC. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application XPO'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
105 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-12-06 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by QIUHENG LIAO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by XPO GF AMERICA, INC. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2017
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by QIUHENG LIAO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by XPO GF AMERICA, INC. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by XPO GF AMERICA, INC. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by QIUHENG LIAO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by QIUHENG LIAO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • Summons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less