This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2019 at 01:15:17 (UTC).

QINGDAO YOULI CENTURY GUARENTEE CO LTD VS SHAOQIANG CHEN ET

Case Summary

On 05/07/2018 QINGDAO YOULI CENTURY GUARENTEE CO LTD filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against SHAOQIANG CHEN ET. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5350

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QINGDAO YOULI CENTURY GUARANTEE CO. LTD

Defendants

REN YIQUN

CHEN SHAOQIANG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WOO FELIX T. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR: (1) ENFORCEMENT OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT UNDER UNIFORM FOREIGN COUNTRY MONEY JUDGMENTS RECOGNITION ACT (2) BREACH OF CONTRACT

5/7/2018: COMPLAINT FOR: (1) ENFORCEMENT OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT UNDER UNIFORM FOREIGN COUNTRY MONEY JUDGMENTS RECOGNITION ACT (2) BREACH OF CONTRACT

SUMMONS

5/7/2018: SUMMONS

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

5/16/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/16/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

6/19/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Order of Dismissal) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Qingdao Youli Century Guarantee Co., LTD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: (1) ENFORCEMENT OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT UNDER UNIFORM FOREIGN COUNTRY MONEY JUDGMENTS RECOGNITION ACT (2) BREACH OF CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Qingdao Youli Century Guarantee Co., LTD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

FELIX WOO (SBN 208107)

felix.woo@dentons.com

DENTONS US LLP | | Fl%&%afimmia

601 South Figueroa Street, Suite 2500 Superior B o Angeles

Los Angeles, California 90017-5704 °

Telephone: (213) 623-9300 | MAY 07 2018

Facsimile: (213) 623-9924 \ . inar/Clerk Sherr Deput

Attorneys for Plaintiff By, oy

QINGDAO YOULI CENTURY GUARANTEE CO., LTD n Gomez

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES | | BC70535

QINGDAO YOULI CENTURY Case No. GUARANTEE CO., LTD., a Chinese company, COMPLAINT FOR: Plaintiff, (1) ENFORCEMENT OF FOREIGN

JUDGMENT UNDER UNIFORM

VS. FOREIGN COUNTRY MONEY

| JUDGMENTS RECOGNITION ACT

SHAOQIANG CHEN, an individual, YIQUN REN, an individual, and DOES 1-5, (2) BREACH OF CONTRACT

Defendant.

ORIGINAL

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOO FELIX THOMAS