This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/07/2019 at 11:15:49 (UTC).

PYNG SOON VS AUTOTELIC INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/29/2018 PYNG SOON filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against AUTOTELIC INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD L. FRUIN and JOEL L. LOFTON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9774

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RICHARD L. FRUIN

JOEL L. LOFTON

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

SOON PYNG

Defendants and Respondents

LIPOMEDICS INC.

TRIEU VUONG

AUTOTELIC INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

KAHANA & FELD LLP

KAHANA AMIR M. ESQ.

KAHANA AMIR MOSHE ESQ.

ATTAL AVI ESQ.

AHN MIMI

SHAHAM YARON

KAHANA AMIR ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

MCKIBBIN ROBYN M.

BLOZAN LESLIE A.

 

Court Documents

Witness List - WITNESS LIST (JOINT)

9/9/2019: Witness List - WITNESS LIST (JOINT)

Trial Brief

9/12/2019: Trial Brief

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

9/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Complaint

8/29/2018: Complaint

Answer

2/8/2019: Answer

Notice of Deposit - Jury

1/17/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Objection - Objection to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice

11/15/2018: Objection - Objection to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice

Notice of Ruling

12/17/2018: Notice of Ruling

Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Demurrer

10/29/2018: Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Demurrer

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to Unverified Complaint

10/29/2018: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike to Unverified Complaint

Order - Ruling on Demurrer of Defendants to Plaintiff's Complaint

12/17/2018: Order - Ruling on Demurrer of Defendants to Plaintiff's Complaint

Declaration - Supplemental Declaration of Robyn M. McKibbin, Esq. in Support of Demurrer to Unverified Complaint

12/7/2018: Declaration - Supplemental Declaration of Robyn M. McKibbin, Esq. in Support of Demurrer to Unverified Complaint

Minute Order - Minute Order (Demurrer of Defts Autotelic Inc, Lipomedics Inc and Vuong Tri...)

11/30/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Demurrer of Defts Autotelic Inc, Lipomedics Inc and Vuong Tri...)

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/28/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/12/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/12/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUMMONS -

8/29/2018: SUMMONS -

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

8/29/2018: NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial ((2-3 days)) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial (2-3 days))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (re Estrella Herman, 13865); Filed by Autotelic, Inc. (Defendant); Lipomedics Inc. (Defendant); Vuong Trieu (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketWitness List (AMENDED JOINT WITNESS LIST); Filed by Pyng Soon (Plaintiff); Autotelic, Inc. (Defendant); Lipomedics Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 93, Joel L. Lofton, Presiding; Jury Trial ((five days)) - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Jury Trial ((five days)) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ((Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Jury Trial ((five days)) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Pyng Soon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketProof of Service Summons; Filed by Pyng Soon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Pyng Soon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Pyng Soon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment (- UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE - IC); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ATTAL AVI

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAHAM YARON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAHANA AMIR MOSHE