Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2021 at 22:15:11 (UTC).

PUBLIC STORAGE VS SPITZER, PAUL

Case Summary

On 12/23/2020 PUBLIC STORAGE filed a Labor - Workplace Violence lawsuit against SPITZER, PAUL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SCULLY, ELIZABETH and COHEN, LAURA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6925

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Violence

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SCULLY, ELIZABETH

COHEN, LAURA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PUBLIC STORAGE

Respondent

SPITZER PAUL

Other

ARELLANO LESLIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DUNKIN CRAIG LEE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/1/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

1/11/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

1/11/2021: Minute Order

Petition - Workplace Violence

12/23/2020: Petition - Workplace Violence

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

12/23/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - And Addendum

12/23/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - And Addendum

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Partly Granted

12/23/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Partly Granted

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 94, Cohen, Laura, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Case Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 94, Scully, Elizabeth, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketPetition - Workplace Violence; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (Partly Granted ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (And Addendum )

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PUBLIC STORAGE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUNKIN CRAIG L.