This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2021 at 06:36:44 (UTC).

PUBLIC STORAGE VS JOHNSON, WILLIAM

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 PUBLIC STORAGE filed a Labor - Workplace Violence lawsuit against JOHNSON, WILLIAM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SAUCEDA, A. VERONICA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0382

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Violence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SAUCEDA, A. VERONICA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PUBLIC STORAGE

Respondent

JOHNSON WILLIAM

Other

GRAY CASSANDRA SHAVONNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DUNKIN CRAIG LEE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

5/6/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

4/15/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

4/15/2021: Minute Order

Petition - Workplace Violence

3/26/2021: Petition - Workplace Violence

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

3/26/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

3/26/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

3/26/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 102, Sauceda, A. Veronica, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 102, Sauceda, A. Veronica, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketPetition - Workplace Violence; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PUBLIC STORAGE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUNKIN CRAIG L.