This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/20/2021 at 12:33:45 (UTC).

PUBLIC STORAGE VS ABRAMS, TIMOTHY

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 PUBLIC STORAGE filed a Labor - Workplace Violence lawsuit against ABRAMS, TIMOTHY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CLAY, CHARLES Q.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1266

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Workplace Violence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CLAY, CHARLES Q.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PUBLIC STORAGE

Respondent

ABRAMS TIMOTHY

Other

MALDONADO KIMBERLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DUNKIN CRAIG LEE

 

Court Documents

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

8/13/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition - Workplace Violence

8/12/2021: Petition - Workplace Violence

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

8/12/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

8/12/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Proof of Service

8/25/2021: Proof of Service

Minute Order

9/3/2021: Minute Order

Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

9/3/2021: Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 202, Clay, Charles Q., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO Before Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing (Form 130); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketPetition - Workplace Violence; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PUBLIC STORAGE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUNKIN CRAIG L.