This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2019 at 00:48:29 (UTC).

PUBILL, NASER FERNANDO VS MARAVILLA, YESICA SUYAPA

Case Summary

On 09/12/2018 PUBILL, NASER FERNANDO filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against MARAVILLA, YESICA SUYAPA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0010

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LEWIS, THOMAS TRENT

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PUBILL NASER FERNANDO

Respondent

MARAVILLA YESICA SUYAPA

Not Classified By Court

LACEY JACKIE - District Attorney

WEISKE MICHELLE MARIE - Deputy District Attorney for District Attorney

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

MARCUS DAVID L

SHIELL WARREN ROBERT

Respondent Attorney

ARIAS JESUS EDUARDO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/20/2018

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Order Made

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2018

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2018

DocketMinute Order as Order After Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2018

Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2018

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/18/2018

Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/18/2018

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/17/2018

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/17/2018

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2018

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
11/21/2018

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2018

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Lewis, Thomas Trent, Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2018

DocketProof of Service (Proof of Personal Service ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2018

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2018

DocketMiscellaneous (Memorandum of Law ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2018

DocketMiscellaneous (Points and Authorities in Support of Expedited Proceedings ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2018

DocketMiscellaneous (for a Warrant in Lieu of a Writ of Habeas Corpus ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2018

DocketPetition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law; Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2018

DocketNotice (of Application for Return of Minor Child ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2018

DocketMiscellaneous (Warrant in Leiu of Writ of Habeas Corpus ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less