This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/02/2021 at 09:35:29 (UTC).

PRTC, L.P., A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS MEDANI P. MAINALI, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/03/2021 PRTC, L P , A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MEDANI P MAINALI, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8544

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRTC L.P. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

BHATTARAI AN INDIVIDUAL NIRAJ

KARKI AN INDIVIDUAL ABHA

MAINALI AN INDIVIDUAL MEDANI P.

THAPA AN INDIVIDUAL BINDU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARTIN GREGG A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/3/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/3/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/3/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Mail

9/28/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Answer

9/28/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2022
  • Hearing03/02/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 12 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by NIRAJ BHATTARAI, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by NIRAJ BHATTARAI, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by PRTC, L.P., a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by PRTC, L.P., a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by PRTC, L.P., a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRTC L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTIN GREGG ADAM