This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/28/2019 at 11:28:35 (UTC).

PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA VS AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC., A CALIFORNIA FOR PROFIT CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA, INC , A CALIFORNIA FOR PROFIT CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3224

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA DBA PROVIDENCE SAINT JOHN'S HEALTH CENTER A CALIFORNIA NOT-FOR-PROFIT CORPORATION

Defendants

AETNA HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC

AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA INC. A CALIFORNIA FOR PROFIT CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JIAO JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/18/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/18/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/18/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/19/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/26/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

10/29/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/29/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

12/4/2019: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Providence Health System - Southern California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Providence Health System - Southern California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Providence Health System - Southern California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Providence Health System - Southern California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Providence Health System - Southern California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Providence Health System - Southern California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AETNA HEALTH MANAGEMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AETNA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM-SOUTHERN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JIAO JENNIFER