This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/12/2020 at 06:32:26 (UTC).

PROSPECT FUNDING HOLDINGS, LLC VS THE LAW FIRM OF MICHAEL T. CHULAK & ASSOCIATES

Case Summary

On 06/04/2020 PROSPECT FUNDING HOLDINGS, LLC filed an Other - Sister State Judgment lawsuit against THE LAW FIRM OF MICHAEL T CHULAK ASSOCIATES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1845

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Sister State Judgment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROSPECT FUNDING HOLDINGS LLC

Defendant

THE LAW FIRM OF MICHAEL T. CHULAK & ASSOCIATES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MINASSIAN NATALIA

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR SISTER STATE JUDGMENT

6/4/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR SISTER STATE JUDGMENT

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER STATE JUDGMENT

6/4/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER STATE JUDGMENT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/4/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Application for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment

6/4/2020: Application for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

8/14/2020: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NATALIA MINASSIAN IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OR WRIT AND ABSTRACT AND TO CORRECT JUDGMENT DEBTOR NAME

8/14/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NATALIA MINASSIAN IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OR WRIT AND ABSTRACT AND TO CORRECT JUDGMENT DEBTOR NAME

Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

8/14/2020: Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Prospect Funding Holdings, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of natalia minassian in support of issuance or writ and abstract and to correct judgment debtor name); Filed by Prospect Funding Holdings, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution ((Los Angeles)); Filed by Prospect Funding Holdings, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Entry of Judgment on Sister State Judgment); Filed by Prospect Funding Holdings, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Prospect Funding Holdings, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketApplication for Entry of Judgment on Sister-State Judgment; Filed by Prospect Funding Holdings, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (in support of application for sister state judgment); Filed by Prospect Funding Holdings, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Prospect Funding Holdings LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MINASSIAN NATALIA