This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/24/2020 at 04:46:57 (UTC).

PROLOGIS USLV OPERATING PARTNERSHIP, L . P., A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS BAY KAY TRADING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 PROLOGIS USLV OPERATING PARTNERSHIP, L P , A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against BAY KAY TRADING INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY GREEN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0604

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROLOGIS USLV OPERATING PARTNERSHIP L . P. A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendant

BAY KAY TRADING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION AKA BAY KAY TRADING INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FLEMING SHELDON J.

Defendant Attorney

TAM MARIA W

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

2/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-JURY TRIAL)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/20/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Answer

12/27/2019: Answer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/27/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

12/30/2019: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

12/31/2019: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

1/14/2020: Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

Notice of Status Conference and Order

1/16/2020: Notice of Status Conference and Order

Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE TO SET A TRIAL DATE

1/21/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE TO SET A TRIAL DATE

Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL

1/27/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL (UNLAWFUL DETAINER)) OF 01/27/2020

1/27/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL (UNLAWFUL DETAINER)) OF 01/27/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL (UNLAWFUL DETAINER))

1/27/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL (UNLAWFUL DETAINER))

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/17/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

12/18/2019: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/6/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/6/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/27/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/20/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Status Conference (to Set Case for Trial (Unlawful Detainer)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Trial); Filed by PROLOGIS USLV OPERATING PARTNERSHIP, L . P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference to Set Case for Trial (Unlawful Detainer)) of 01/27/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference to Set Case for Trial (Unlawful Detainer))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF STATUS CONFERENCE TO SET A TRIAL DATE); Filed by PROLOGIS USLV OPERATING PARTNERSHIP, L . P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketRequest/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial; Filed by PROLOGIS USLV OPERATING PARTNERSHIP, L . P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by PROLOGIS USLV OPERATING PARTNERSHIP, L . P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by PROLOGIS USLV OPERATING PARTNERSHIP, L . P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by PROLOGIS USLV OPERATING PARTNERSHIP, L . P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((BAY KAY TRADING INC. a California corporation)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by PROLOGIS USLV OPERATING PARTNERSHIP, L . P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by PROLOGIS USLV OPERATING PARTNERSHIP, L . P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by PROLOGIS USLV OPERATING PARTNERSHIP, L . P., a Delaware limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FLEMING SHELDON J