This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/17/2022 at 13:38:23 (UTC).

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY VS MORIS SAKHAI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/12/2022 PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against MORIS SAKHAI,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9669

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

LAW OFFICES OF PAUL KINGSTON

SAKHAI MORIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KORFF EVE HELENE

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/12/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

9/12/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/12/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint in Interpleader

9/12/2022: Complaint in Interpleader

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/12/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/12/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/26/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/26/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/17/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE

11/14/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2023
  • Hearing02/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • Hearing02/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketNotice Notice of Case Managment Conference; Filed by: Progressive Select Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Moris Sakhai (Defendant); Law Offices of Paul Kingston (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Progressive Select Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Moris Sakhai (Defendant); Law Offices of Paul Kingston (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 40

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 40

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Eve Helene Korff (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Shaver Korff et al LLP to Shaver Korff & Castronovo LLP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • DocketAddress for Eve Helene Korff (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. David Sotelo in Department 40 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketComplaint in Interpleader; Filed by: Progressive Select Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Moris Sakhai (Defendant); Law Offices of Paul Kingston (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Progressive Select Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Moris Sakhai (Defendant); Law Offices of Paul Kingston (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KORFF EVE H. ESQ.