This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/08/2019 at 00:21:28 (UTC).

PROFESSIONAL PEACE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/28/2019 PROFESSIONAL PEACE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, A PUBLIC ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0267

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PROFESSIONAL PEACE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION

Respondents

ALEX VILLANUEVA IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF

LOS ANGELES COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES A PUBLIC ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HAYES DENNIS JOHN

Respondent Attorney

SHELDON GEOFFREY SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Unknown

3/4/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

3/4/2019: Minute Order

Answer

3/4/2019: Answer

Minute Order

3/5/2019: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

3/5/2019: Ex Parte Application

Order - Dismissal

3/5/2019: Order - Dismissal

Order

2/8/2019: Order

Minute Order

2/8/2019: Minute Order

Petition for Writ of Mandate

1/28/2019: Petition for Writ of Mandate

Summons

1/28/2019: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/28/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown

1/28/2019: Unknown

Declaration

1/30/2019: Declaration

Ex Parte Application

1/30/2019: Ex Parte Application

Declaration

1/30/2019: Declaration

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

1/30/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Proof of Personal Service

1/31/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/31/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department 86; Order to Show Cause Re: (name extension) (Alternate Writ of Mandate) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 86; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (name extension) (to Intervene and Lift Stay) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (name extension) (to Intervene and Lift Stay); Filed by Professional Peace Officers Association (Petitioner); County of Los Angeles, a public entity (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application By Media For Leave to Interve...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Order - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • at 4:15 PM in Department 82; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • at 4:00 PM in Department 82; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (COURT ORDER) of 03/04/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Minute Order ( (COURT ORDER)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Answer (County's Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandate; Alternative Writ of Mandate; and Request for Stay Order); Filed by County of Los Angeles, a public entity (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Professional Peace Officers Association (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by Professional Peace Officers Association (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Professional Peace Officers Association (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Memorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by Professional Peace Officers Association (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Declaration (name extension) (of Dennis J Hayes Esq. in support of ex parte application for writ of mandate); Filed by Professional Peace Officers Association (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Declaration (name extension) (of Dennis J Hayes and exhibits in support of application for writ of mandate); Filed by Professional Peace Officers Association (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Summons (on Petition); Filed by Professional Peace Officers Association (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Professional Peace Officers Association (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Petition for Writ of Mandate; Filed by Professional Peace Officers Association (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROFESSIONAL PEACE OFFICERS ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAYES DENNIS J. ESQ.