This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2021 at 04:43:36 (UTC).

PRIVILEGE UNDERWRITERS RECIPROCAL EXCHANGE VS WILLIAM DANIELS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/23/2021 PRIVILEGE UNDERWRITERS RECIPROCAL EXCHANGE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WILLIAM DANIELS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7297

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRIVILEGE UNDERWRITERS RECIPROCAL EXCHANGE

Defendants

A PLUS PLUMBING

DANIELS WILLIAM

MIYAZAKI ASAKO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TOLBERT NED E.

Other Attorneys

SOMES RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/27/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/23/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/23/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/15/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT / DEFAULT REJECTED

9/14/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT / DEFAULT REJECTED

Proof of Personal Service

9/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • Hearing11/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default Rejected); Filed by PRIVILEGE UNDERWRITERS RECIPROCAL EXCHANGE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by PRIVILEGE UNDERWRITERS RECIPROCAL EXCHANGE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by PRIVILEGE UNDERWRITERS RECIPROCAL EXCHANGE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by PRIVILEGE UNDERWRITERS RECIPROCAL EXCHANGE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by PRIVILEGE UNDERWRITERS RECIPROCAL EXCHANGE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRIVILEGE UNDERWRITERS RECIPROCAL EXCHANGE is a litigant