This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/15/2019 at 11:36:52 (UTC).

PRISCILLA PEREZ ET AL VS ALFONSO SOLORANZO ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 PRISCILLA PEREZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALFONSO SOLORANZO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5892

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PEREZ PAMELA

PEREZ PRISCILLA

Defendants

CAMACHO RAFAEL

SOLORANZO ALFONSO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YAGOUBZADEH JOSHUA ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

HUMPHREY CRAIG ALAN

SANDE PAUL W.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/14/2017: Complaint

Summons

9/14/2017: Summons

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/14/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Ex Parte Application

5/16/2019: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

5/16/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

4/18/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Unknown

3/25/2019: Unknown

Answer

3/25/2019: Answer

Stipulation and Order

1/2/2019: Stipulation and Order

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/5/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial and All Related Dates) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (to Continue Trial and All Related Dates); Filed by Priscilla Perez (Plaintiff); Pamela Perez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Ex Parte Application of Plaintiffs Priscilla Perez and Pamela...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Joshua, Yagoubzadeh, Esq. (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Alfonso Soloranzo (Defendant); Rafael Camacho (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint on behalf of Alfonso Solorzano and Rafael Camacho; Demand for Trial by Jury); Filed by Alfonso Soloranzo (Defendant); Rafael Camacho (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District)); Filed by Alfonso Soloranzo (Defendant); Rafael Camacho (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Priscilla Perez (Plaintiff); Pamela Perez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Priscilla Perez (Plaintiff); Pamela Perez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Priscilla Perez (Plaintiff); Pamela Perez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Priscilla Perez (Plaintiff); Pamela Perez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****5892    Hearing Date: July 02, 2020    Dept: 28

Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Having considered the moving papers, the Court rules as follows. opposing papers have been filed.

BACKGROUND

On September 14, 2017, Plaintiffs Priscilla Perez and Pamela Perez (collectively, “Plaintiffs”) filed a complaint against Defendants Alfonso Soloranzo, Rafael Camacho, and Does 1-50 (collectively, “Defendants”), alleging causes of action for negligence, negligence per se, and statutory liability for a motor vehicle collision that occurred on September 2, 2015.

On March 5, 2020, Daniel Yagoubzadeh, counsel for Plaintiffs (“Counsel”), filed a motion to be relieved as counsel pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure section 284, subdivision (2).

On March 18, 2020, the Court continued the hearing date on Counsel’s motion to be relieved as counsel to May 7, 2020.

On April 17, 2020, the Court continued the hearing date on Counsel’s motion to be relieved as counsel to July 2, 2020.

A trial setting conference is scheduled for September 2, 2020. 

PARTY’S REQUEST

Daniel Yagoubzadeh seeks to be relieved as counsel for Plaintiffs because he was unable to obtain Plaintiffs’ consent to change attorneys. Counsel further states that the specific facts which gave rise to the instant motion are confidential and attorney-client privileged, and that in the event the Court desires further information to ascertain his good faith basis for withdrawal, Counsel requests an in camera hearing to demonstrate the specific facts. LEGAL STANDARD

California Rule of Court rule 3.1362 (Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel) requires (1) notice of motion and motion to be directed to the client (made on the Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel—Civil form (MC-051)); (2) a declaration stating in general terms and without compromising the confidentiality of the attorney-client relationship why a motion under Code of Civil Procedure section 284(2) is brought instead of filing a consent under Code of Civil Procedure section 284(1) (made on the Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel—Civil form (MC-052)); (3) service of the notice of motion and motion and declaration on all other parties who have appeared in the case; and (4) the proposed order relieving counsel (prepared on the Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel—Civil form (MC-053)).

The court has discretion to allow an attorney to withdraw, and such a motion should be granted provided that there is no prejudice to the client and it does not disrupt the orderly process of justice. (See Ramirez v. Sturdevant (1994) 21 Cal.App.4th 904, 915.)

DISCUSSION

The Court initially notes that opposing papers had be filed and personally served on June 19, 2020, at the latest, to conform with the mandates of California Code of Civil Procedure section 1005.  No opposing papers were timely filed and served.  The Court exercises its discretion in refusing to consider any late opposition pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 3.1300, subdivision (d).

Counsel has completed and filed forms MC-051, MC-052, and MC-053.  These documents were served on Plaintiffs on March 4, 2020 by personal service, and on Defendants’ counsel on March 5, 2020 by personal service. 

The Court finds that the motion is proper. There is no evidence showing Plaintiffs would be prejudiced or the orderly process of justice would be disrupted in granting this motion. Trial is set for September 14, 2020. Plaintiffs have enough time to retain substitute counsel and for that counsel to prepare for trial. CONCLUSION

The motion is GRANTED. Daniel Yagoubzadeh is relieved as counsel for Plaintiff effective upon the filing of the proof of service of Order Granting Attorney’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel–Civil form MC–053.

Counsel is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

The parties are directed to the header of this tentative ruling for further instructions.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YAGHOUBZADEH, JOSHUA E