This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/08/2022 at 06:41:51 (UTC).

PRISCILLA AGUILAR VS OWENS-BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER INC.

Case Summary

On 09/08/2021 PRISCILLA AGUILAR filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against OWENS-BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III, DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM, YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS and MAREN NELSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3017

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

MAREN NELSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AGUILAR PRISCILLA

HARO JULIAN

MADERA JUAN

NUNEZ RICHARD

Defendant

OWENS-BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAWKINS JAMES R.

Defendant Attorney

BERTOLDI CANDANCE

 

Court Documents

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

4/8/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL C...)

4/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL C...)

Notice of Removal to Federal Court - DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF STATUS OF REMOVED CASE

4/1/2022: Notice of Removal to Federal Court - DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF STATUS OF REMOVED CASE

Proof of Personal Service

11/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

11/22/2021: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

11/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER;)

11/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER;)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

11/22/2021: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Initial Status Conference Order

11/22/2021: Initial Status Conference Order

Answer

12/2/2021: Answer

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

12/6/2021: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT;) OF 12/07/2021

12/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT;) OF 12/07/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT;)

12/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT;)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

10/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 10/06/2021

10/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 10/06/2021

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

10/14/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/18/2021

10/18/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/18/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

10/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReStatus of Removal to Federal Court) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Status of Removal to Federal C...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDefendant's Notice of Status of Removed Case; Filed by Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Removal to Federal Court;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Removal to Federal Court;) of 12/07/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2021
  • Docketat 3:28 PM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 10/18/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Priscilla Aguilar (Plaintiff); Julian Haro (Plaintiff); Juan Madera (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • Docketat 2:39 PM in Department 11, David S. Cunningham III, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re. Complex Determination;) of 10/06/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re. Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Priscilla Aguilar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Priscilla Aguilar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Owens-Brockway Glass Container, Inc. is a litigant