This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/17/2022 at 11:20:07 (UTC).

PRISCILLA AGUILAR, ET AL. VS OWENS-BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/15/2021 PRISCILLA AGUILAR filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against OWENS-BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MONICA BACHNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1922

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AGUILAR PRISCILLA

HARO JULIAN

MADERA JUAN

NUNEZ RICHARD

Defendant

OWENS-BROCKWAY GLASS CONTAINER INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LUCIO CHRISTINA M.

Defendant Attorney

THEURER NOLAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/15/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/10/2021: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/17/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Personal Service

3/16/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

3/2/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/2/2022: Case Management Statement

Answer

2/14/2022: Answer

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FEBRUARY 4. 2022 MINUTE ORDER

2/9/2022: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FEBRUARY 4. 2022 MINUTE ORDER

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/04/2022

2/4/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/04/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/4/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Request - REQUEST PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

2/3/2022: Request - REQUEST PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

Case Management Statement

2/2/2022: Case Management Statement

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2023
  • Hearing04/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • Hearing04/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • Hearing12/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Priscilla Aguilar (Plaintiff); Julian Haro (Plaintiff); Juan Madera (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Priscilla Aguilar (Plaintiff); Julian Haro (Plaintiff); Juan Madera (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Owens-Brockway Glass Container Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/04/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketRequest (PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; AND [PROPOSED] ORDER); Filed by Priscilla Aguilar (Plaintiff); Julian Haro (Plaintiff); Juan Madera (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Priscilla Aguilar (Plaintiff); Julian Haro (Plaintiff); Juan Madera (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketNotice (PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Priscilla Aguilar (Plaintiff); Julian Haro (Plaintiff); Juan Madera (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Priscilla Aguilar (Plaintiff); Julian Haro (Plaintiff); Juan Madera (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Priscilla Aguilar (Plaintiff); Julian Haro (Plaintiff); Juan Madera (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Priscilla Aguilar (Plaintiff); Julian Haro (Plaintiff); Juan Madera (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Owens-Brockway Glass Container, Inc. is a litigant