This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/14/2021 at 21:09:53 (UTC).

PRICE, REED BRYDEN VS LUCA, APRIL

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 PRICE, REED BRYDEN filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against LUCA, APRIL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are IWASAKI, BRUCE G., THOMAS, HOLLY A., LEIS, COLIN P. and RIFF, LAWRENCE P.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0720

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

IWASAKI, BRUCE G.

THOMAS, HOLLY A.

LEIS, COLIN P.

RIFF, LAWRENCE P.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PRICE REED BRYDEN

Respondent

LUCA APRIL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BARDAVID JULIO ROBERT

Respondent Attorneys

KLEEMAN DENA A.

KLEEMAN DENA ANNE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 46; Restraining Order Hearing - Denied - RO- After Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 46; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 46; Hearing - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 46; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 41, Leis, Colin P., Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Riff, Lawrence P., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2B, Thomas, Holly A., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketResponse; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KLEEMAN DENA ANNE