This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2022 at 03:28:33 (UTC).

PRESTIGE LAW FIRM, P.C., FORMERLY KNOWN AS THE LAW OFFICES OF PAUL AGHABALA AND ASSOCIATES VS LUIS MORILLO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/21/2021 PRESTIGE LAW FIRM, P C , FORMERLY KNOWN AS THE LAW OFFICES OF PAUL AGHABALA AND ASSOCIATES filed an Other lawsuit against LUIS MORILLO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6612

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Defendants

ADVANCE PAIN MANAGEMENT

ANAHEIM ADVANCED IMAGING

ANESTHESIA PROVIDER GROUP

ANTHEM

AZUSA PAIN MANAGEMENT

AZUSA SURGERY CENTER

BEVERLY HILLS AMBULATORY SURGERY CENTERS

BEVERLY HILLS ANETHESIA

BIOHEALTH PAIN MANAGEMENT

BROADWAY SURGERY SPECIALISTS

BROTMAN MEDICAL ANESTHESIA GROUP

CALIFORNIA BACK & PAIN SPECIALISTS

CHIROPRACTIC DR. ROMERO

DR. AVI ISHAAYA CENTERS

EMDADI DR. ALIREZA

HAAS SPINE & ORTHOPAEDICS

KASIMIAN DR. STEPAN

MEDFACTOR

MEDSURANT HEALTH

MILLER DR. LAWRENCE

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

BRANDON DAVID MARSHALL

KIM CHRISTIAN

AHLUWALIA JASDEEP SINGH

SARRAO MICHAEL

Other Attorneys

AGHABALA PAYAM PAUL

 

Court Documents

Complaint in Interpleader

12/21/2021: Complaint in Interpleader

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

5/18/2022: Answer

Request for Dismissal

5/11/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

5/11/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

5/11/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

5/11/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

5/11/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

5/11/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

5/11/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

5/11/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

5/3/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Answer

5/3/2022: Answer

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/22/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Case Management Statement

4/25/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/26/2022: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

4/29/2022: Proof of Personal Service

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2022
  • Hearing07/13/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Pico Square Pharmacy (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Prestige Law Firm, P.C., formerly known as The Law offices of Paul Aghabala and Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Prestige Law Firm, P.C., formerly known as The Law offices of Paul Aghabala and Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Prestige Law Firm, P.C., formerly known as The Law offices of Paul Aghabala and Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Prestige Law Firm, P.C., formerly known as The Law offices of Paul Aghabala and Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Prestige Law Firm, P.C., formerly known as The Law offices of Paul Aghabala and Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Prestige Law Firm, P.C., formerly known as The Law offices of Paul Aghabala and Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Prestige Law Firm, P.C., formerly known as The Law offices of Paul Aghabala and Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Prestige Law Firm, P.C., formerly known as The Law offices of Paul Aghabala and Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Prestige Law Firm, P.C., formerly known as The Law offices of Paul Aghabala and Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Prestige Law Firm, P.C., formerly known as The Law offices of Paul Aghabala and Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Nova Surgical Institute, Inc., a California corporation Erroneously Sued As Nova Surgical Institute (Defendant); California Back and Pain Specialists, a California corporation Erroneously Sued As California Back & Pain Specialists (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Olympia Health Care, LLC dba Olympia Medical Center Erroneously Sued As Olympia Medical Center (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Prestige Law Firm, P.C., formerly known as The Law offices of Paul Aghabala and Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Prestige Law Firm, P.C., formerly known as The Law offices of Paul Aghabala and Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Prestige Law Firm, P.C., formerly known as The Law offices of Paul Aghabala and Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint in Interpleader; Filed by Prestige Law Firm, P.C., formerly known as The Law offices of Paul Aghabala and Associates (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HAAS SPINE AND ORTHOPAEDICS is a litigant

Latest cases where ADVANCED PAIN MANAGEMENT is a litigant