This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/15/2021 at 11:51:41 (UTC).

PRESTI, MATTHEW VS CHU, JANEY

Case Summary

On 07/06/2020 PRESTI, MATTHEW filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CHU, JANEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SILBERMAN, HARVEY A., HEIDEL, SARAH J. and PELLMAN, AMY M.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0918

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SILBERMAN, HARVEY A.

HEIDEL, SARAH J.

PELLMAN, AMY M.

 

Party Details

Appellant and Petitioner

PRESTI MATTHEW

Claimant

BROCK SHEILA G.

Respondent

CHU JANEY

Other

ORANGE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT

Not Classified By Court

DDS LEGAL SPPPORT SYSTME INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Petitioner Attorneys

MCCALL LISA R.

BAGDASERIANS PATRICK

BACA ERICA M.

Respondent and Claimant Attorney

MCALARNEN JULIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department K, Heidel, Sarah J., Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department K, Heidel, Sarah J., Presiding; Request for Order Hearing - Submitted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCase Under Submission for Decision; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketMotion (Notice of Evidentiary Objections and Motion to Strike Portions of the Declaration of Julie McAlarnen, ESQ. ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
124 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Incoming Transfer - Family Law

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketAcknowledgement of Receipt of Documents Re: Case Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketRFO/MTN - Compel (Notice To Compel Responses: Form Interrog &Demand For Prod ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketJudgment - Reserved Issues - Contested (Bifurcated Issue on Child Custody - Orignal filed 07/10/2013 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketJudgment - Reserved Issues - Uncontested (Original filed 3/24/2015 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment (on Reserved Issues - Original filed 03/24/2015 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment (Status Only - Original filed 11/30/2012 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment (on Reserved Issues-Bifurcated Issue of Child Custody - Original filed 07/10/2013 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DDS LEGAL SUPPORT SYSTEMS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCALARNEN JULIE