This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/21/2022 at 21:39:38 (UTC).

PREMIER SPINE AND NEUROSURGERY VS UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/25/2022 PREMIER SPINE AND NEUROSURGERY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7196

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PREMIER SPINE AND NEUROSURGERY

Defendant

UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STIEGLITZ JONATHAN A

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/25/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/25/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/25/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/25/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/25/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/25/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/25/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

5/25/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/2/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

7/6/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2022
  • Hearing09/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by premier spine and neurosurgery (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by premier spine and neurosurgery (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by premier spine and neurosurgery (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by premier spine and neurosurgery (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Healthcare Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STIEGLITZ JONATHAN A