This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 00:12:19 (UTC).

PREFERRED HOTEL GROUP, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS CHOO CHOO PARTNERS, LP, A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Case Summary

On 06/24/2020 PREFERRED HOTEL GROUP, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHOO CHOO PARTNERS, LP, A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3948

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PREFERRED HOTEL GROUP INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION AKA HISTORIC HOTELS OF AMERICA

Defendant

CHOO CHOO PARTNERS LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AKA THE CHATANOOGA CHOO CHOO

Not Classified By Court

PHILLIPS JERRY S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PHILLIPS JERRY S.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/24/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/24/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/24/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/24/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/29/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/29/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

8/17/2020: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement

8/14/2020: Notice of Settlement

Request for Dismissal

1/5/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 16; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by PREFERRED HOTEL GROUP, INC., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by PREFERRED HOTEL GROUP, INC., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by PREFERRED HOTEL GROUP, INC., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by PREFERRED HOTEL GROUP, INC., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by PREFERRED HOTEL GROUP, INC., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PREFERRED HOTEL GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PHILLIPS JERRY S.