This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/19/2021 at 11:19:51 (UTC).

PRECISION MANUFACTURED DEVELOPMENTS, INCORPORATED, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS PACIFIC PALISADES BOWL MOBILE ESTATES DEL, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/29/2020 PRECISION MANUFACTURED DEVELOPMENTS, INCORPORATED, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against PACIFIC PALISADES BOWL MOBILE ESTATES DEL, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1665

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

PRECISION MANUFACTURED DEVELOPMENTS INCORPORATED

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

PACIFIC PALISADES BOWL MOBILE ESTATES DEL LLC

PACIFIC PALISADES BOWL MOBILE ESTATES LLC

WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION

PACIFIC PALISADES BOWL MOBILE ESTATES LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

PACIFIC PALISADES BOWL MOBILE ESTATES LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

PACIFIC PALISADES BOWL MOBILE ESTATES LLC AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

PHELPS DANIEL J.

MANNINGER EMILY ZUNG

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

EARLE JAMES E

MARCHANT WILLIAM LUTHER

 

Court Documents

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION OF PRECISION MANUFACTURED DEVELOPMENTS, INCORPORATED TO THE DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DECLARATION IN SUPPORT

7/1/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION OF PRECISION MANUFACTURED DEVELOPMENTS, INCORPORATED TO THE DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DECLARATION IN SUPPORT

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

6/17/2021: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

6/17/2021: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

6/16/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Case Management Statement

6/7/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

5/27/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

5/14/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

Cross-Complaint

4/21/2021: Cross-Complaint

Complaint

10/29/2020: Complaint

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 07/20/2021

7/20/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 07/20/2021

Proof of Service by Mail

6/21/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

6/17/2021: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Request for Judicial Notice

6/16/2021: Request for Judicial Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

4/8/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/9/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

12/29/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/29/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • Hearing11/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • Hearing09/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 24 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (2nd)); Filed by Precision Manufactured Developments, Incorporated (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketNotice (Re 1. Order Granting Daniel J. Phelps's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel 2. Nunc Pro Tunc Order 3 Scheduled Proceedings); Filed by Precision Manufactured Developments, Incorporated (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Daniel J. Phelps (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 07/20/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Precision Manufactured Developments, Incorporated (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Precision Manufactured Developments, Incorporated (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Precision Manufactured Developments, Incorporated (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Precision Manufactured Developments, Incorporated (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Pendency of Action); Filed by Precision Manufactured Developments, Incorporated (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Precision Manufactured Developments, Incorporated (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Precision Manufactured Developments, Incorporated (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Precision Manufactured Developments, Incorporated (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRECISION MANUFACTURED DEVELOPMENTS INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFIC PALISADES BOWL MOBILE ESTATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PHELPS DANIEL J