This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 06:24:28 (UTC).

PRAJESH MAHARA, ET AL. VS BURKE STREET FEE OWNER, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 PRAJESH MAHARA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BURKE STREET FEE OWNER, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARGARET MILLER BERNAL and BRIAN F. GASDIA. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0108

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

BRIAN F. GASDIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MAHARA PRAJESH

HALWAI ISHA

JOSEPH ATO

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

BURKE STREET FEE OWNER LLC

FPI MANAGEMENT INC.

HALWAI AN INDIVIDUAL ISHA

MAHARA AN INDIVIDUAL PRAJESH

JOSEPH AN INDIVIDUAL ATO

Not Classified By Court

ALL STATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

AMIN PARAG L.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

WILLIAMS RICHARD MARTIN

GUTHRIE GEORGE A.

CERVANTES ADRIANA CAROLINA

CAMERLENGO KATHRYN T.

CAMERLENGO KATHRYN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

7/12/2021: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AS TO PLAINTIFF ATO JOSEPH ...)

7/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AS TO PLAINTIFF ATO JOSEPH ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AS TO PLAINTIFF ATO JOSEPH ...)

6/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AS TO PLAINTIFF ATO JOSEPH ...)

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY BURKE STREET FEE OWNER, LLC, 5/28/19

6/23/2021: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY BURKE STREET FEE OWNER, LLC, 5/28/19

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

6/23/2021: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AS TO PLAINTIFF ATO JOSEPH ...)

5/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL AS TO PLAINTIFF ATO JOSEPH ...)

Notice of Ruling

4/14/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

4/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (VOLUNTARY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (VOLUNTARY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

10/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

10/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC)) OF 10/01/2020

10/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC)) OF 10/01/2020

Answer

6/12/2020: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC); TRIAL SETTING CONFEREN...)

8/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC); TRIAL SETTING CONFEREN...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

8/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC))

Notice - NOTICE OF DATES FROM MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE ON AUGUST 4, 2020

8/4/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF DATES FROM MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE ON AUGUST 4, 2020

Amended Complaint

6/10/2020: Amended Complaint

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER ADVANCING AND VACATING TRIAL DATES;) OF 06/03/2020

6/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER ADVANCING AND VACATING TRIAL DATES;) OF 06/03/2020

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Without Prejudice as to Entire Action of All Parties and All Causes of Action); Filed by Ato Joseph (Plaintiff); FPI Management, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (of remaining parties and pleadings) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (as to plaintiff Ato Joseph Only, non-appearance calendar) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal as to plaintiff Ato Joseph ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (With Prejudice as to Cross Complaint filed by Burke Street Fee Owner, LLC, 5/28/19; ONLY Plaintiffs Prajesh Mahara and Isha Halwai Dismissing Defendants Burke Street Fee Owner LLC and FPI Management Inc., from First Amended Complaint on 6/10/20.); Filed by Burke Street Fee Owner, LLC (Cross-Complainant); Burke Street Fee Owner, LLC (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by FPI Management, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (of remaining parties and pleadings) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department R, Brian F. Gasdia, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (as to plaintiff Ato Joseph Only, non-appearance calendar) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal as to plaintiff Ato Joseph ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department R, Brian F. Gasdia, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (as to plaintiff Ato Joseph Only, non-appearance calendar) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Burke Street Fee Owner, LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Docketsummons on cross-complaint; Filed by Burke Street Fee Owner, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Prajesh Mahara (Plaintiff); Isha Halwai (Plaintiff); Ato Joseph (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Burke Street Fee Owner, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Prajesh Mahara (Plaintiff); Isha Halwai (Plaintiff); Ato Joseph (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Prajesh Mahara (Plaintiff); Isha Halwai (Plaintiff); Ato Joseph (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint (Negligent Breach of Contract/warranty); Filed by Prajesh Mahara (Plaintiff); Isha Halwai (Plaintiff); Ato Joseph (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BURKE STREET FEE OWNER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ALL STATE INSURANCE is a litigant

Latest cases where FPI MANAGEMENT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAMS, RICHARD M.