This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/24/2022 at 13:29:24 (UTC).

PRAETORIAN INSURANCE COMPANY VS MICHAEL SEAN VERT, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/27/2022 PRAETORIAN INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MICHAEL SEAN VERT,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1602

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PRAETORIAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

BRAND SAFWAY INDUSTRIES LLC

BRAND SAFWAY SERVICES LLC

EAN HOLDINGS LLC

VERT MICHAEL SEAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ABED NIZAR M

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

9/27/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

9/27/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/27/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/27/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

9/27/2022: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2024
  • Hearing09/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2024
  • Hearing03/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2024
  • Hearing03/12/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: PRAETORIAN INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL SEAN VERT (Defendant); EAN HOLDINGS, LLC (Defendant); BRAND SAFWAY SERVICES, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: PRAETORIAN INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/12/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: PRAETORIAN INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: MICHAEL SEAN VERT (Defendant); EAN HOLDINGS, LLC (Defendant); BRAND SAFWAY SERVICES, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EAN Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Insurance Company B is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Abed, Nizar Michael